TUESDAY HANDICAPPED CLUB

Charity number: 503660
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 189 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 189 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 555 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 555 days
Annual return 31 December 2017 09 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 13 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 26 February 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required