TUESDAY HANDICAPPED CLUB

Charity number: 503660
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017
Total gross income £12.68k £12.50k £13.38k £9.11k £8.78k
Total expenditure £9.70k £13.55k £16.57k £8.94k £9.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A