THE ROOFTOP MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of the Christian religion through evangelism and education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Bangladesh
- Benin
- Bulgaria
- Burundi
- Colombia
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Costa Rica
- Czech Republic
- El Salvador
- Germany
- Ghana
- Guinea
- Honduras
- India
- Kenya
- Liberia
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Namibia
- Nepal
- Nigeria
- Pakistan
- Panama
- Peru
- Romania
- Rwanda
- Sierra Leone
- South Africa
- South Korea
- Tanzania
- Uganda
- United States
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 03 June 2013: Standard registration
- VIZ A VIZ MINISTRIES (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael John Burgess | Chair | 23 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Andy Scott-Evans | Trustee | 12 December 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.61k | £56.28k | £94.25k | £82.15k | £37.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.13k | £50.92k | £83.88k | £83.37k | £57.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/03/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 12/12/2014
Charitable objects
FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY COMMUNICATING THE GOOD NEWS THROUGH EVANGELISM AND THE TEACHING AND TRAINING OF CHRISTIAN DISCIPLES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 Ian Road
BILLERICAY
Essex
CM12 0JZ
- Phone:
- 07974648272
- Email:
- info@therooftop.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window