Financial history MALVERN HILLS FOODBANK

Charity number: 1151964
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022
Total gross income £33.36k £34.51k £140.40k £178.37k £209.44k
Total expenditure £25.80k £31.25k £115.79k £171.92k £197.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.56k £1.88k £15.95k £1.88k