Trustees MALVERN HILLS FOODBANK

Charity number: 1151964
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Edward Peter Thwaite BUCHANAN BSC PGCE Chair 07 May 2013
None on record
Julie Elliott Trustee 11 April 2022
None on record
Jane Elspeth Marshall Trustee 22 November 2021
None on record
Rachael Mary Rowswell Trustee 22 November 2021
None on record
Sandra Veronica Lillis Trustee 30 November 2020
None on record
Roger Watson BD, MTH Trustee 25 November 2019
None on record
Amanda Louise Hornsby MBA Trustee 25 November 2019
None on record
ELIZABETH MARY WILLIAMS BA Trustee 20 November 2013
None on record
MIKE HAYES MAPHD Trustee 24 September 2013
None on record
ANNE THERESA GARNER Trustee 07 May 2013
None on record