THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST CHAD, PATTINGHAM WITH ST MARY, PATSHULL

Charity number: 1151604
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 23 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 09 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 09 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 17 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 17 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 21 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 21 April 2017 On time Download