THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST CHAD, PATTINGHAM WITH ST MARY, PATSHULL

Charity number: 1151604
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £132.60k £182.20k £164.72k £158.44k £104.48k
Total expenditure £112.41k £149.53k £176.26k £129.29k £96.60k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.08k £0 N/A N/A N/A