Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST CHAD, PATTINGHAM WITH ST MARY, PATSHULL

Charity number: 1151604
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Philip Sims Chair 07 April 2019
CHARITY OF JANE CARTWRIGHT
Received: On time
PATTINGHAM EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Graham Ashbee Tritton Trustee 05 January 2024
None on record
AMELIA COLIN-STOKES Trustee 06 June 2023
None on record
Dr Iain Coleman Trustee 03 September 2022
None on record
Tracey Elizabeth Williams Trustee 08 May 2021
None on record
Alan Michael Smith Trustee 24 November 2020
None on record
Dorothy Margaret Steel Trustee 30 April 2019
THE CHURCH ESTATE
Received: On time
Clive Edward Pendrell Trustee 11 September 2018
PATTINGHAM EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Anthony Ainsworth Trustee 27 April 2014
None on record
Geoffrey Leonard Keith Dann Trustee 14 April 2013
None on record
MICHAEL HENRY IBBERSON Trustee 07 April 2013
WOMBOURNE AND DISTRICT CHORAL SOCIETY
Received: On time