YCP (NORTHWEST)

Charity number: 1151657
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire West & Chester
  • Wirral

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 April 2013: CIO registration
  • 20 July 2016: Removed (Removed by application)
  • 20 July 2016: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 14 March 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 14 March 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 14 March 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 14 March 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 14 March 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 14 March 2014 Not submitted