Trustees BOLNORE VILLAGE COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP
Charity number: 1152374
Charity reporting is up to date (104 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Bannister | Chair | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Grant | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Bannister | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sam Larby | Trustee | 19 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anne Boutrop | Trustee | 17 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Coombes | Trustee | 02 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Benjamin Wolfe Jeffers | Trustee | 06 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Charlie Smith | Trustee | 31 July 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.