Accounts and annual returns THE NINA LOUISE SPREADBURY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1151729
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 15 September 2021 16 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 15 September 2020 04 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 15 September 2019 18 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 15 September 2018 03 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 15 September 2017 28 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 September 2017 Not Required