PROGRESSIVE INITIATIVE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1156032
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2019 17 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2018 29 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2017 26 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2016 26 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2015 27 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2015 Not Required