AFRICAN CARRIBBEAN DENTAL ASSOCIATION UK

Charity number: 1157068
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £9.55k £9.89k £12.27k £11.18k £12.92k
Total expenditure £9.26k £11.32k £8.72k £12.05k £9.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A