Trustees EALING SOUP KITCHEN

Charity number: 1152247
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard Sarson Chair 05 December 2015
None on record
Angela Stewart Hailstone Trustee 30 April 2021
None on record
Naomi Rattrey Trustee 30 June 2018
None on record
Alan Timothy Reynolds Trustee 22 February 2017
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT JOHN WITH SAINT JAMES, WEST EALING
Received: On time
Alan Simpson Trustee 14 October 2015
None on record
John Carter Trustee 11 October 2013
None on record
JULIAN HOWARD LLOYD BSC Trustee 05 April 2013
None on record