Financial history SWINNERTON TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1152372
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £581.61k £548.53k £658.62k £701.87k £700.63k
Total expenditure £568.01k £544.13k £603.87k £622.16k £651.21k
Income from government contracts £277.13k £240.59k £364.04k £444.75k N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £51.16k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.84k £3.18k £2.61k £6.27k £55.03k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £536.62k £503.63k £614.80k £652.99k £603.65k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £43.16k £41.72k £41.22k £42.61k £41.95k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £563.89k £540.89k £600.74k £616.70k £644.33k
Expenditure - Raising funds £4.12k £3.24k £3.14k £5.45k £6.87k
Expenditure - Governance £17.79k £23.82k £0 £0 £3.01k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £4.12k £3.24k £3.14k £0 £6.87k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0