LARGE BREED DOG RESCUE

Charity number: 1154504
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 02 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 02 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 13 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 15 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 05 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 05 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 21 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 21 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 29 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 29 January 2018 On time Download