LARGE BREED DOG RESCUE

Charity number: 1154504
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £42.96k £110.17k £65.55k £41.94k £46.16k
Total expenditure £30.68k £47.75k £34.32k £28.05k £41.45k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A