THE ATRIUM NORTH NORFOLK LTD
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Running educational arts based programmes and projects for children and young people, families and the elderly . Mounting and promoting theatre and concerts , hosting visual arts exhibitions . Working with schools to extend their extra-curricular programmes. Regular cinema screenings of classics and new releases. Collaborating with local organisations in staging festivals and events .
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 30 March 2017
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Hamdden
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Norfolk
Llywodraethu
- 19 Mehefin 2013: Cofrestrwyd
- 08 Ebrill 2018: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
- THE ATRIUM (Enw gwaith)
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 05/04/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 01/04/2016 | 30/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £96.13k | £148.23k | £90.49k | £37.74k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £79.40k | £121.77k | £95.86k | £66.35k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | £14.00k | £0 | £0 |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Mawrth 2018 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Mawrth 2018 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Mawrth 2017 | 06 Tachwedd 2017 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Mawrth 2017 | 06 Tachwedd 2017 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 01 Ebrill 2016 | 12 Ionawr 2017 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 01 Ebrill 2016 | 21 Rhagfyr 2016 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2015 | 15 Ionawr 2016 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2015 | 21 Rhagfyr 2015 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 FEB 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24/06/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PEOPLE OF ALL AGES IN NORTH WALSHAM AND THE SURROUNDING VILLAGES AND MORE WIDELY ACROSS NORTH NORFOLK IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE PROVISION OF: (I) EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES, FACILITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR ENGAGEMENT IN ARTISTIC AND CULTURAL ACTIVITIES; (II) EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES, FACILITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES THAT PROMOTE THE HEALTH OF INDIVIDUALS AND THE PUBLIC IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; (III) EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES AND ACTIVITIES FOR PUPILS ATTENDING SCHOOLS AND COLLEGES IN NORTH WALSHAM AND NORTH NORFOLK. 2. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window