Accounts and annual returns MILDENHALL & DISTRICT SWIMMING CLUB

Charity number: 1154407
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 23 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 05 October 2021 97 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 05 October 2021 97 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 25 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 25 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 28 August 2019 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 28 August 2019 59 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 13 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 13 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window