Financial history MILDENHALL & DISTRICT SWIMMING CLUB

Charity number: 1154407
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £45.05k £37.70k £42.93k £26.99k £7.47k
Total expenditure £50.02k £42.38k £41.88k £25.71k £11.27k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A