DEVON GENERAL OMNIBUS TRUST

Charity number: 1153451
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 13 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 13 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 09 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 09 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 22 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 23 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 01 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 01 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 25 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 15 November 2017 On time Download