DEVON GENERAL OMNIBUS TRUST

Charity number: 1153451
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £10.55k £22.68k £17.03k £15.45k £27.09k
Total expenditure £6.36k £29.61k £16.75k £14.94k £7.18k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k