AL-MADINA ISLAMIC & CULTURAL CENTRE SURBITON

Charity number: 1157559
Charity reporting is up to date (230 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £22.98k £20.71k £29.67k £18.66k £102.84k
Total expenditure £5.95k £5.56k £5.42k £5.86k £3.68k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A