SKY HIGH TRAMPOLINE GYMNASTICS ACADEMY

Charity number: 1152878
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 24 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 24 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 10 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 10 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 08 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 08 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 02 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 02 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 23 August 2017 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 11 July 2017 On time Download