SOUTH NORMANTON AND PINXTON CLUB FOR THE DISABLED

Charity Number: 503686
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

BINGO, HOY. QUIZ ENTERTAINMENT, TRIPS.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £5,568
Total expenditure: £5,939

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 November 1974: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • S N A P (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SHEILA LEIVERS Trustee 24 August 2012
None on record
VALERIE MEREDITH Trustee
None on record
JEAN DUTTON Trustee
None on record
MR ROY LEIVERS Trustee
None on record
JEAN WALKER Trustee
None on record
F FYNN Trustee
None on record
MRS E M HENTON Trustee
None on record
MRS M HILL Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £368 £997 £6.13k £1.52k £5.57k
Total expenditure £193 £1.22k £6.53k £1.45k £5.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 21 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 06 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 15 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 March 2022 131 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
14 LIME CLOSE
PINXTON
NOTTINGHAM
NG16 6LZ
Phone:
07818268967
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available