901 TROOP MARINE CADETS

Charity number: 1153100
Charity reporting is up to date (22 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2020 23 February 2021 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 23 February 2021 22 days late Download
Annual return 01 April 2019 11 March 2020 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2018 10 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2017 17 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2017 24 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 01 April 2016 13 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2016 Not Required