SUTCLIFF BAPTIST CHURCH, OLNEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Based in Olney near Milton Keynes, the charity provides regular public worship, prayer, Bible Study, preaching and teaching. It is involved in evangelism and mission locally, nationally and internationally by supporting Christian organisations. It provides nurturing, education and training for service, pastoral care and support. It is also involved in various activities with the local community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 25 April 2013: Standard registration
- OLNEY BAPTIST CHURCH (Working name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carrie Emma Walker | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Mark Billingsley | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Iain Hailes | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Caroline Griffiths | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Stuart James Macdonald | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Elizabeth Angela Richardson | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Tremayne Wharpshire | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £152.28k | £139.44k | £120.10k | £132.90k | £92.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £149.51k | £117.38k | £140.22k | £157.33k | £95.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 NOV 2012 as amended on 25 Jan 2023 as amended on 23 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSE OF THE CHURCH IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sutcliff Baptist Church
Market Place
Olney
Bucks
MK46 4EA
- Phone:
- 01234240759
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window