WHICKHAM COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1152975
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 13 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 05 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 14 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

14 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 27 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

27 January 2017 On time Download