Financial history THE MICHAEL GREEN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1152602
Charity reporting is overdue by 808 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £19.99k £24.62k £33.85k £22.51k £113
Total expenditure £24.33k £7.64k £16.99k £18.66k £252
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A