Financial history YSGOL TREMEIRCHION PTA

Charity number: 1151799
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 26/10/2016 26/10/2017 26/10/2018 26/10/2019 26/10/2020
Total gross income £2.00k £3.21k £4.17k £2.66k £143
Total expenditure £1.66k £2.94k £3.50k £1.80k £1.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A