TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION WITH THE LONDON SPIRITUAL MISSION

Charity number: 1152206
Charity reporting is overdue by 28 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £80.04k £71.67k £71.86k £97.86k £68.93k
Total expenditure £29.10k £43.96k £66.99k £106.15k £110.21k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A