Trustees FORMA ARTS AND MEDIA LIMITED

Charity number: 1152156
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anders Hemmingsen Chair 05 February 2015
None on record
Himali Singh Soin Trustee 22 June 2022
None on record
Catherine Charlotte Bonham-Carter Trustee 10 December 2019
None on record
Yves Carmichael Blais Trustee 10 December 2019
None on record
Laura Helen Parker Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Chris Sharp Trustee 01 December 2016
None on record