Accounts and annual returns SALUS FATIGUE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1151924
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 13 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 13 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 11 November 2021 195 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 16 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 03 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 03 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 04 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 04 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2017 02 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 02 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window