Financial history SALUS FATIGUE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1151924
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £197.21k £74.45k £124.52k £169.00k £156.55k
Total expenditure £164.58k £124.80k £124.88k £169.00k £147.00k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £29.60k