Accounts and annual returns YOGI, THE SPINAL INJURIES HOLIDAY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1152937
Charity reporting is overdue by 1579 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 118 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 118 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 483 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 483 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 848 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 848 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1213 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1213 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1579 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1579 days