Accounts and annual returns NEW LIFE SUPPORT

Charity number: 1156235
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 14 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 14 November 2017 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

13 November 2017 13 days late Download Open in new window