KINGS LYNN FOODBANK

Charity number: 1151936
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £45.95k £26.65k £40.13k £42.12k £76.04k
Total expenditure £39.73k £22.53k £25.81k £40.58k £48.85k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.00k £1.50k £1.50k N/A £10.00k