FOOTPRINTS IN THE COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1153121
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 24 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 24 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 09 June 2020 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 09 June 2020 9 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 27 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 27 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 24 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 24 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 18 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 18 January 2017 On time Download