THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST THOMAS OF CANTERBURY, GORING ON THAMES

Charity number: 1152514
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

St Thomas's Parochial Church Council has the responsibility of co-operating with the incumbent in promoting in the ecclesiastical parish, the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £201,450
Total expenditure: £204,238

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 June 2013: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST THOMAS OF CANTERBURY'S PCC, GORING ON THAMES (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev BEN PHILLIPS Chair 04 February 2019
POOR'S ALLOTMENT CHARITY
Received: On time
GORING ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
Alison Gray Trustee 14 June 2023
None on record
MATTHEW WALKER Trustee 23 April 2023
ALDWORTH LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
THE BROTHER JOHN FARLEY MEMORIAL FUND
Received: On time
THE LIBRARY AND MUSEUM CHARITABLE TRUST OF THE PROVINCIAL GRAND LODGE OF BERKSHIRE
Received: On time
READING BLUE COAT AND ARCHBISHOP LAUD CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Christopher Tassell Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Bridget Braham Trustee 03 April 2022
None on record
Melissa Walker Trustee 27 April 2021
READING STREET PASTORS
Received: On time
Simon Merritt Trustee 04 November 2020
None on record
Rob Howard Trustee 23 April 2018
LYBBE'S ALMSHOUSES (2018)
Received: On time
Rev Wendy Josephine Middleton Trustee 01 July 2017
None on record
Judith Ann Hogg Trustee 27 April 2015
None on record
ELIZABETH PARKINSON Trustee 06 April 2014
None on record
BRENDA MAY KERR MUIR Trustee 18 June 2013
None on record
JUDITH ELIZABETH AGUDA Trustee 18 June 2013
None on record
MR DON SHRIMPTON Trustee 18 June 2013
None on record
Rev ELIZABETH JEAN DOWDING Trustee 18 June 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £149.91k £295.49k £217.61k £221.87k £201.45k
Total expenditure £104.96k £101.80k £202.92k £307.68k £204.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 20 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 20 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 28 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 11 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 23 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
C/O THE VICARAGE
MANOR ROAD
GORING
READING
RG8 9DR
Phone:
01491875651