BARDSLEY YOUTH PROJECT

Charity number: 1152836
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £61.38k £40.50k £42.02k £54.96k £112.51k
Total expenditure £47.24k £43.41k £53.94k £59.70k £60.53k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £16.90k