Accounts and annual returns THE BLUE COAT SCHOOL BIRMINGHAM LIMITED

Charity number: 1152244
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 20 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 20 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 25 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 25 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 29 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 07 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 07 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 11 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 11 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window