Financial history THE BLUE COAT SCHOOL BIRMINGHAM LIMITED

Charity number: 1152244
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £6.27m £6.61m £6.94m £6.84m £7.29m
Total expenditure £6.37m £7.05m £7.72m £7.00m £7.27m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £246.29k
Income - Donations and legacies £32.37k £20.23k £12.99k £19.94k £31.60k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £90.60k
Income - Charitable activities £5.77m £6.07m £6.45m £6.38m £6.48m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £413.13k £454.17k £442.89k £439.62k £439.39k
Income - Other £57.77k £64.56k £35.65k £0 £246.29k
Income - Legacies £32.37k £20.23k £12.99k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.37m £7.05m £7.72m £7.00m £7.18m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £89.03k
Expenditure - Governance £27.35k £44.40k £34.37k £17.37k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0