THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY'S ASH VALE

Charity number: 1152717
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £111.46k £116.26k £142.15k £145.35k £144.42k
Total expenditure £114.42k £132.00k £150.42k £144.26k £148.80k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £2.00k N/A N/A