Accounts and annual returns THE MANCHESTER DISTRICT ASSOCIATION OF UNITARIAN AND FREE CHRISTIAN CHURCHES

Charity number: 503753
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 24 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 01 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 07 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 07 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 16 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required