THE MANCHESTER DISTRICT ASSOCIATION OF UNITARIAN AND FREE CHRISTIAN CHURCHES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The income and capital from this fund is to be applied to the upkeep, repair and improvement of churches whose congregations are members of the Association and to the maintenance of services and otherwise furthering the religious, educational and charitable work of the Association.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Lancashire
- Manchester City
Governance
- 25 November 1974: Standard registration
- 04 February 1994: Removed
- MDA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vincent Gerard McCully | Trustee | 08 June 2021 |
|
|||||||
laura Dobson | Trustee | 08 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Rev DANIEL CROSBY | Trustee | 09 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||
MARK DOUGLAS PEARCE | Trustee | 09 June 2020 |
|
|||||||
Jeffery Lane Gould Reverend | Trustee | 04 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Geoffery John Levermore Professor | Trustee | 04 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Christopher Cody Coyne Reverend | Trustee | 04 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £785.69k | £46.06k | £14.73k | £43.42k | £42.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £235.20k | £236.52k | £42.02k | £109.67k | £119.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £49.21k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £736.48k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £235.20k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £30.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £205.21k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 NOVEMBER 1971 AND LICENCE DATED 23 NOVEMBER 1972 AND ORDER DATED 18 JANUARY 1973. as amended on 09 Jun 2020 as amended on 08 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
THE DIFFUSION AND SUPPORT OF THE PRINCIPLES OF UNITARIAN CHRISTIANITY AND LIBERAL RELIGION IN THE MANCHESTER DISTRICT AND ELSEWHERE. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF THE MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 NOVEMBER 1971).
Area of benefit
MANCHESTER DISTRICT OR ELSEWHERE
Linked charities
- 25 November 1974 : Standard registration
- 04 February 1994 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cross Street Chapel
29 Cross Street
MANCHESTER
M2 1NL
- Phone:
- 07401872137
- Email:
- mda.secretary@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window