Friends Fighting Cancer Ltd

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE ARE A GRANT GIVING CHARITY, PROVIDING GRANTS TO THOSE AFFECTED BY CANCER IN OUR LOCAL COMMUNITY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 January 2014: Standard registration
- FFC (Working name)
- FOOTBALL FOR CANCER (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lee Cook | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Sparks | Trustee | 22 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
LINNETE ANN OGILVIE | Trustee | 05 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £178.43k | £104.89k | £242.97k | £319.45k | £389.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £148.48k | £120.33k | £196.43k | £294.30k | £419.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 09 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 09 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 22 May 2023 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 22 May 2023 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 21 May 2021 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 21 May 2021 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06/12/2013 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 17/12/2013 as amended on 07 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION MAY DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
48B High Street
Cosham
PORTSMOUTH
Hampshire
PO6 3AG
- Phone:
- 02392612334
- Email:
- info@ffcevents.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window