Financial history BURGHILL ACADEMY PTFA

Charity number: 1152718
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £15.07k £14.04k £19.41k £12.68k £3.14k
Total expenditure £10.99k £10.52k £23.34k £25.17k £4.02k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A