"R&R" (RESTORE AND RESETTLE)LTD

Charity number: 1152800
Charity reporting is overdue by 452 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2014 31/05/2015 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 30/06/2018
Total gross income £9.26k £37.22k £23.20k £12.00k £0
Total expenditure £10.23k £34.85k £23.57k £2.40k £0
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A