HUMBERSIDE POLICE WELFARE AND BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 503762
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £9.95k £14.30k £13.15k £13.86k £15.09k
Total expenditure £22.61k £16.72k £27.38k £28.95k £13.75k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A