SUNNAH AID

Charity number: 1153864
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 05 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 22 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 26 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 06 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 03 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required